KY HB74 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-07 - to Health and Family Services (H)
Pending: House Health and Family Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-07 - to Health and Family Services (H)
Pending: House Health and Family Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS 216.2920 to 216.2929 to require all hospitals to annually survey employees on patient safety culture; require the Cabinet for Health and Family Services to design, collect, analyze, and publish survey data; list requirements for the survey design; list requirements for the survey content; require the survey design to be completed by October 30, 2020, and the survey results to be made available by June 30 each year beginning with June 30, 2021, on the cabinet's Web site and reported to the Interim Joint Committee on Health, Welfare, and Family Services; permit the cabinet to promulgate administrative regulations to implement the survey requirements.
Title
AN ACT relating to patient safety by requiring Kentucky hospitals to annually survey employees regarding patient safety culture and practices with the results to be publicly reported on a Web site maintained by the Cabinet for Health and Family Services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-07 | House | to Health and Family Services (H) |
2020-01-07 | House | introduced in House |
2019-10-29 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |
Subjects
Administrative Regulations and Proceedings
Health and Medical Services
Hospitals and Nursing Homes
Nurses
Physicians and Practitioners
Public Health
Public Safety
Research and Methods
State Agencies
Health and Medical Services
Hospitals and Nursing Homes
Nurses
Physicians and Practitioners
Public Health
Public Safety
Research and Methods
State Agencies
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/20RS/hb74.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/20RS/hb74/orig_bill.pdf |