KY HB71 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 50)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-02 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 50)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 531.010 to define "private erotic matter"; create a new section of KRS Chapter 531 to prohibit the distribution of sexually explicit images without consent; make such distribution a Class A misdemeanor for the first offense and a Class D felony for the second or subsequent offense, unless it is done for profit, in which case it is a Class D felony for the first offense and a Class C felony for the second or subsequent offense.
Title
AN ACT relating to distribution of sexually explicit images without the consent of the person depicted.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 398 (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SCS 1, SFA 1 RSN# 601 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 601 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 63 (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SCS 1, SFA 1 RSN# 601 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 601 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 63 (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-02 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 50) |
2018-03-27 | House | delivered to Governor |
2018-03-27 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2018-03-22 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2018-03-22 | House | passed 90-2 |
2018-03-22 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute and floor amendment (1) |
2018-03-22 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute and floor amendment (1) |
2018-03-22 | House | taken from Rules (H) |
2018-03-22 | House | to Rules (H) |
2018-03-22 | House | received in House |
2018-03-21 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute (1) floor amendment (1) |
2018-03-20 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 21, 2018 |
2018-03-16 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2018-03-16 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-03-15 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2018-01-31 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2018-01-30 | Senate | received in Senate |
2018-01-29 | House | 3rd reading, passed 89-0 with Committee Substitute |
2018-01-26 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, January 29, 2018 |
2018-01-25 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-01-24 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2018-01-04 | House | posted in committee |
2018-01-02 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2018-01-02 | House | introduced in House |