KY HB71 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-24 - to Rules (H)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-24 - to Rules (H)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 222.005 to define "incapacitated by alcohol and other drug abuse"; amend KRS 222.431 to permit a person meeting the definition of "incapacitated by alcohol and other drug abuse" to be court ordered to treatment; amend KRS 222.432 to provide that court-ordered alcohol and other drug abuse treatment may be covered by a third-party payor; amend KRS 222.433 to require the court to review previous drug or alcohol assessments and drug tests in an order for treatment and require the court to review previous drug or alcohol assessments or drug tests if a respondent has failed to participate in a physical examination; amend KRS 222.470 to require Medicaid and private insurers to use comparative medical necessity and reimbursement methodology to cover alcohol and other drug abuse treatment services.
Title
AN ACT relating to treatment for alcohol and other drug abuse.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-24 | House | to Rules (H) |
2015-03-24 | House | received in House |
2015-03-24 | Senate | passed 31-7 with Committee Substitute (2), committee amendment (2-title) |
2015-03-24 | Senate | committee amendment (1-title) withdrawn |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Committee Substitute (1) withdrawn |
2015-03-24 | Senate | 3rd reading |
2015-03-24 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 24, 2015 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (2), committee amendment (2-title) as a Consent Bill |
2015-03-24 | Senate | recommitted to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S) |
2015-03-24 | Senate | taken from the Regular Orders of the Day |
2015-03-23 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2015-03-23 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 23, 2015 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-03-10 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) |
2015-03-03 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2015-02-27 | Senate | received in Senate |
2015-02-26 | House | 3rd reading, passed 90-1 |
2015-02-25 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 27, 2015 |
2015-02-25 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 27, 2015 |
2015-02-25 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-02-23 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2015-02-03 | House | posted in committee |
2015-01-06 | House | to Health & Welfare (H) |
2015-01-06 | House | introduced in House |