KY HB69 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - recommitted to Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs (H)
Pending: House Licensing, Occupations & Administrative Regulations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - recommitted to Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs (H)
Pending: House Licensing, Occupations & Administrative Regulations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 438.305 to define "vapor product enhanced cartridge"; create a new section of KRS 438.305 to 438.340 to require a retailer or manufacturer of a vapor product enhanced cartridge to register and pay a $700 annual fee; prohibit sales of vapor product enhanced cartridge other than through in-person purchase; prohibit sales to anyone under 18, require age verification through an electronic third-party source.
Title
AN ACT relating to vapor products.
Sponsors
Rep. Jerry Miller [R] | Rep. Kimberly Banta [R] | Rep. Thomas Burch [D] | Rep. Joe Graviss [D] |
Rep. Ed Massey [R] | Rep. Kimberly Moser [R] | Rep. Ruth Palumbo [D] | Rep. Buddy Wheatley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | recommitted to Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs (H) |
2020-02-24 | House | floor amendment (6) filed to Committee Substitute |
2020-02-18 | House | floor amendment (5) filed to Committee Substitute |
2020-02-13 | House | floor amendments (2), (3) and (4) filed to Committee Substitute |
2020-02-13 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-02-12 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2020-02-12 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-02-10 | House | posted in committee |
2020-01-07 | House | to Licensing, Occupations, & Admin Regs (H) |
2020-01-07 | House | introduced in House |
2019-10-21 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |
Subjects
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/20RS/hb69.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/20RS/hb69/orig_bill.pdf |