KY HB69 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 45)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS Chapter 158 to define "aphasia," "dyscalculia," dyslexia," "phonemic awareness," and "scientifically based research"; require the Kentucky Board of Education to promulgate administrative regulations for district-wide reporting on the use of K-3 response-to-intervention implementation in reading by August 1, 2013, in mathematics by August 1, 2014, and behavior by August 1, 2015; require the Department of Education to make available technical assistance, training, and a Web-based resource to assist all local school districts in the implementation of the system and instructional tools based on scientifically based research; require the department to collaborate with other state agencies and organizations; require conformity with 20 U.S.C. sec. 1414(a)(1)(E) for initial evaluations of students with suspected disabilities; require the department to report to the Interim Joint Committee on Education on implementation by November 30, 2013, and annually thereafter; amend KRS 157.200 to conform with the federal definition of a "specific learning disability."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to early education assessment and intervention.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-04-11 signed by Governor (Acts ch. 45)
2012-03-30 delivered to Governor
2012-03-30 enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2012-03-27 enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2012-03-27 received in House
2012-03-26 3rd reading, passed 36-0
2012-03-26 posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 26, 2012
2012-03-22 reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a Consent Bill
2012-03-21 returned to Education (S)
2012-03-21 1st reading
2012-03-21 taken from Education (S)
2012-02-06 to Education (S)
2012-02-01 received in Senate
2012-01-31 3rd reading, passed 98-0 with Committee Substitute
2012-01-25 posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, January 31, 2012
2012-01-25 2nd reading, to Rules
2012-01-24 reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute
2012-01-05 posted in committee
2012-01-03 to Education (H)
2012-01-03 introduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback