KY HB67 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-21 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-21 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 72 to limit lawful distribution of autopsy photographs, images, video, or audio recordings to specified persons and agencies; amend KRS 72.992 to provide penalty for violating the prohibition on dissemination of autopsy photographs, images, or video or audio recordings.
Title
AN ACT relating to autopsy records.
Sponsors
Rep. James Tipton [R] | Rep. Robert Benvenuti [R] | Rep. Richard Heath [R] | Rep. Ruth Palumbo [D] |
Rep. Diane St Onge [R] | Rep. Susan Westrom [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-21 | House | signed by Governor |
2017-03-14 | House | delivered to Governor |
2017-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2017-03-14 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2017-03-14 | House | passed 78-15 |
2017-03-14 | House | House concurred in Senate floor amendments (1) and (2) |
2017-03-14 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate floor amendments (1) and (2) |
2017-03-14 | House | to Rules (H) |
2017-03-14 | House | received in House |
2017-03-08 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-1 with floor amendments (1) and (2) |
2017-03-06 | Senate | floor amendment (2) filed |
2017-03-06 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 8, 2017 |
2017-03-03 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed |
2017-03-03 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-03-02 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2017-02-14 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | received in Senate |
2017-02-10 | House | 3rd reading, passed 94-0 with Committee Substitute (1) floor amendment (2) |
2017-02-09 | House | floor amendment (1) and (2) filed to Committee Substitute |
2017-02-09 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 10, 2017 |
2017-02-09 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-02-08 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2017-02-07 | House | posted in committee |
2017-01-03 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2017-01-03 | House | introduced in House |
2016-11-02 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |