KY HB67 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-18 - to Transportation (S)
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-18 - to Transportation (S)
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 189 to allow a local school board to sell advertising on school buses; prohibit certain types of advertising.
Title
AN ACT relating to school buses.
Sponsors
Rep. Terry Mills [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-18 | to Transportation (S) | |
2011-02-16 | received in Senate | |
2011-02-15 | 3rd reading, passed 61-35 with floor amendments (1) and (2) | |
2011-02-10 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 11, 2011 | |
2011-02-09 | floor amendment (2) filed | |
2011-02-09 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2011-02-08 | floor amendment (1) filed | |
2011-02-08 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | |
2011-02-04 | posted in committee | |
2011-01-04 | to Education (H) | |
2011-01-04 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB67.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB67/bill.doc |