KY HB64 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 14)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

Create new sections of KRS Chapter 217 to define terms; permit eligible veterans to use hyperbaric oxygen treatment for treatment of traumatic brain injury; establish the conditions for use of hyperbaric oxygen treatment; prohibit sanctions of health care providers; clarify the duties of health care insurers regarding hyperbaric oxygen treatment; prohibit certain actions by state officials; provide that the Act may be known as the Colonel Ron Ray Veterans Traumatic Brain Injury Treatment Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to traumatic brain injury treatment for veterans.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 478 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 62 (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-13Housesigned by Governor (Acts, ch. 14)
2018-03-01Housedelivered to Governor
2018-03-01Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2018-03-01Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2018-03-01Housereceived in House
2018-02-28Senate3rd reading, passed 38-0
2018-02-28Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 28, 2018
2018-02-22Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2018-02-21Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2018-01-31Senateto Health & Welfare (S)
2018-01-30Senatereceived in Senate
2018-01-29House3rd reading, passed 89-0
2018-01-26Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, January 29, 2018
2018-01-25House2nd reading, to Rules
2018-01-24Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2018-01-11Houseposted in committee
2018-01-02Houseto Veterans, Military Affairs, and Public Protection (H)
2018-01-02Houseintroduced in House
2017-11-21HousePrefiled by the sponsor(s).

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback