KY HB60 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-19 - signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 29)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-19 - signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 29)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 150 to allow hunters to take coyotes without bag limitation year round; allow hunters to hunt coyotes at night using shotguns that are 10-guage or smaller and bait or electronic calls to attract the coyotes.
Title
AN ACT relating to hunting coyotes.
Sponsors
Rep. Fitz Steele [D] | Rep. Steven Rudy [R] | Rep. Sal Santoro [R] | Rep. Jill York [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-19 | House | signed by Governor (Acts Chapter 29) |
2013-03-11 | House | delivered to Governor |
2013-03-11 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2013-03-06 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2013-03-05 | House | received in House |
2013-03-05 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 5, 2013 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2013-02-27 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2013-02-26 | Senate | to Natural Resources & Energy (S) |
2013-02-22 | Senate | received in Senate |
2013-02-21 | House | 3rd reading, passed 99-1 with Committee Substitute |
2013-02-19 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 21, 2013 |
2013-02-15 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2013-02-14 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2013-01-11 | House | posted in committee |
2013-01-08 | House | to Natural Resources & Environment (H) |
2013-01-08 | House | introduced in House |