KY HB592 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - to State Government (H)
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - to State Government (H)
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 61.522 to move the one-time window where quasi-governmental agencies may voluntarily cease participation in the Kentucky Employees Retirement System (KERS) ahead one year from June 30, 2020, to June 30, 2021, and to move all other corresponding timelines for the window ahead one year.
Title
AN ACT relating to Kentucky Retirement Systems employers.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Graviss [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | to State Government (H) |
2020-03-02 | House | introduced in House |