KY HB569 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS Chapter 217 to define terms; prohibit the manufacture and sale of certain kratom extracts and kratom products; prohibit the sale of kratom extracts and kratom products to any individuals under 21 years of age; establish penalties; provide for the supremacy of any future federal regulations on kratom.
Title
AN ACT relating to consumer protections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | House | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2022-03-29 | House | taken from the Orders of the Day |
2022-03-21 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2022-03-18 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 21, 2022 |
2022-03-18 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-03-17 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2022-03-16 | House | to Health & Family Services (H) |
2022-02-23 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2022-02-23 | House | introduced in House |