KY HB564 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Vetoed on April 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-24 - Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS Chapter 205 to require the Cabinet for Health and Family Services to ensure that home and community-based waiver programs provide certain services, including attendant care or non-skilled in-home care services across all waiver programs, skilled nursing visits for adult day health care and home health care providers, participant-directed services, and RN specialized respite; require the cabinet consolidate all home and community-based waiver application processes under the Department for Medicaid Services, including the Michelle P. waiver provider application process; require the cabinet to apply for and implement a Medicaid state plan benefit to establish health homes to coordinate care for people with Medicaid who have chronic conditions; require the cabinet to promulgate administrative regulations to implement this section.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to waiver programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-04-15 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 389 (Y: 84 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2020-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1465 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-19 - House - House: For Consent RCS# 301 (Y: 82 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-24HouseVetoed
2020-04-15Housedelivered to Governor
2020-04-15Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2020-04-15Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2020-04-15Housepassed 84-2
2020-04-15HouseHouse concurred in Senate floor amendment (2)
2020-04-15Houseposted for passage for concurrence in Senate floor amendment (2)
2020-04-15Housetaken from Rules
2020-04-15Houseto Rules (H)
2020-04-15Housereceived in House
2020-04-15Senatepassed 33-0 with floor amendment (2)
2020-04-15Senatefloor amendment (1) withdrawn
2020-04-15Senate3rd reading
2020-04-14Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2020-04-14Senatefloor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute , floor amendment (2) filed to bill
2020-04-14Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, April 14, 2020
2020-04-14Senatereported favorably, to Rules
2020-04-01Senatereturned to Health & Welfare (S)
2020-04-01Senate2nd reading
2020-04-01Senatetaken from Health & Welfare (S)
2020-03-26Senatereturned to Health & Welfare (S)
2020-03-26Senate1st reading
2020-03-26Senatetaken from Health & Welfare (S)
2020-03-26Senateto Health & Welfare (S)
2020-03-19Senatereceived in Senate
2020-03-19House3rd reading, passed 82-2 with Committee Substitute (1)
2020-03-18Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 19, 2020
2020-03-17House2nd reading, to Rules
2020-03-12Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2020-03-10Houseposted in committee
2020-03-04Houseto Health and Family Services (H)
2020-03-02Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback