KY HB563 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - posting withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - posting withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 532.080 to specify that a jury may elect not to enhance punishment for a persistent felony offender.
Title
AN ACT relating to persistent felony offenders.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | posting withdrawn |
2020-03-06 | House | posted in committee |
2020-03-04 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2020-03-02 | House | introduced in House |