KY HB563 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 130)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on April 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-13 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 130)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 211.863 to clarify that solid wastes from oil and gas drilling operations that contain low-level radioactive wastes are included in prohibited imports; amend KRS 224.50-760 to prohibit importation of certain solid wastes resulting from oil and gas drilling operations.
Title
AN ACT relating to solid waste and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 130) |
2016-04-01 | House | delivered to Governor |
2016-04-01 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2016-04-01 | House | passed 97-0 |
2016-04-01 | House | House concurred in Senate floor amendments (3-title) and (4) |
2016-04-01 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate floor amendments (3-title) and (4) |
2016-04-01 | House | to Rules (H) |
2016-04-01 | House | received in House |
2016-03-29 | Senate | passed 38-0 with floor amendments (4) and (3-title) |
2016-03-29 | Senate | floor amendments (1-title) and (2) withdrawn |
2016-03-29 | Senate | 3rd reading |
2016-03-28 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2016-03-28 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 28, 2016 |
2016-03-23 | Senate | floor amendments (1-title) and (2) and (3-title) and (4) filed |
2016-03-23 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-22 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2016-03-18 | Senate | to Natural Resources & Energy (S) |
2016-03-16 | Senate | received in Senate |
2016-03-15 | House | 3rd reading, passed 97-0 with Committee Substitute (1), committee amendment (1-title) |
2016-03-11 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 14, 2016 |
2016-03-11 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-10 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) committee amendment (1-title) |
2016-03-08 | House | posted in committee |
2016-03-02 | House | to Natural Resources & Environment (H) |
2016-03-01 | House | introduced in House |