KY HB56 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-02 - posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 3, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-02 - posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 3, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 342.650 concerning exemptions from workers' compensation to include lawn services as well as maintenance, repair, remodeling, or similar work on a private home for not more than 20 days.
Title
AN ACT relating to exemptions from workers' compensation coverage.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-02 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 3, 2016 |
2016-02-26 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-02-25 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2016-01-13 | House | posted in committee |
2016-01-05 | House | to Labor & Industry (H) |
2016-01-05 | House | introduced in House |
2015-10-02 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/HB56.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/HB56/bill.doc |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/HB56/bill.pdf |