KY HB56 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-26 - received in House
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-26 - received in House
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 2 naming and designating the Kentucky Long Rifle as the official gun of the Commonwealth of Kentucky.
Title
AN ACT designating the Kentucky Long Rifle as the official gun of the Commonwealth of Kentucky.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-26 | House | received in House |
2013-03-26 | Senate | passed 38-0 with committee amendments (2-title) and (3) |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Committee Substitute withdrawn |
2013-03-26 | Senate | committee amendment (1-title) withdrawn |
2013-03-26 | Senate | 3rd reading |
2013-03-26 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 26, 2013 |
2013-03-26 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with committee amendments (2-title) and (3) as a Consent Bill |
2013-03-26 | Senate | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2013-03-26 | Senate | taken from Rules (S) |
2013-03-07 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) as a Consent Bill |
2013-03-06 | Senate | returned to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2013-03-06 | Senate | 1st reading |
2013-03-06 | Senate | taken from Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2013-03-04 | Senate | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2013-02-27 | Senate | received in Senate |
2013-02-26 | House | 3rd reading, passed 97-0 |
2013-02-22 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 26, 2013 |
2013-02-22 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2013-02-21 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2013-02-19 | House | posted in committee |
2013-01-08 | House | to State Government (H) |
2013-01-08 | House | introduced in House |