KY HB554 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS 164A.555 to 164A.630 to permit governing boards of public supported postsecondary educational institutions to elect to terminate the institution's coverage through the state fire and tornado insurance fund and obtain the coverage from an authorized insurer or through a self-insurance pool; establish requirements for terminating and resuming coverage through the state fire and tornado insurance fund; establish requirements for insurance obtained by an institution from an authorized insurer or a self-insurance pool; amend KRS 164A.575 to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to insurance coverage of state property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 385 (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 3062 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 154 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 3062 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 154 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | House | signed by Governor |
2024-03-28 | House | delivered to Governor |
2024-03-28 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2024-03-27 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2024-03-27 | House | passed 92-0 |
2024-03-27 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-27 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-26 | House | to Rules (H) |
2024-03-26 | House | received in House |
2024-03-26 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-25 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 26, 2024 |
2024-03-22 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2024-03-21 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-08 | Senate | to Banking & Insurance (S) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-02-27 | House | 3rd reading, passed 96-0 |
2024-02-22 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 23, 2024 |
2024-02-22 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-02-21 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2024-02-16 | House | to Banking & Insurance (H) |
2024-02-14 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-02-14 | House | introduced in House |