KY HB553 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-24 - returned to Banking & Insurance (S)
Pending: Senate Banking and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-24 - returned to Banking & Insurance (S)
Pending: Senate Banking and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 286.3-060 toclarify that a bank director or officer may be a man or woman.
Title
AN ACT relating to mortgage loans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-24 | Senate | returned to Banking & Insurance (S) |
2014-03-24 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2014-03-24 | Senate | taken from Banking & Insurance (S) |
2014-03-21 | Senate | returned to Banking & Insurance (S) |
2014-03-21 | Senate | 1st reading |
2014-03-21 | Senate | taken from Banking & Insurance (S) |
2014-03-19 | Senate | to Banking & Insurance (S) |
2014-03-18 | Senate | received in Senate |
2014-03-17 | House | 3rd reading, passed 94-0 with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) |
2014-03-13 | House | placed in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 17, 2014 |
2014-03-13 | House | taken from Rules |
2014-03-13 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-03-12 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) |
2014-03-06 | House | posted in committee |
2014-03-05 | House | to Banking & Insurance (H) |
2014-03-04 | House | introduced in House |