KY HB55 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-27 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch.137)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #6) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-27 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch.137)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #6) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 100.137 to delete language relating to certain cities and their requirements to adopt planning and zoning requirements; amend KRS 100.201, 100.202, and 100.205 to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to planning and zoning in consolidated local governments.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Wayne [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-27 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch.137) |
2016-04-15 | House | delivered to Governor |
2016-04-15 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2016-04-15 | House | passed 81-18 |
2016-04-15 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitutes (1) committee amendment (1-title) |
2016-04-15 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (1) |
2016-04-15 | House | taken from Rules |
2016-04-15 | House | to Rules (H) |
2016-04-15 | House | received in House |
2016-04-15 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 26-11 with Committee Substitutes (1) committee amendment (1-title) |
2016-04-15 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, April 15, 2016 |
2016-04-15 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitutes (1) committee amendment (1-title) |
2016-04-15 | Senate | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2016-03-23 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-22 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2016-02-12 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2016-02-10 | Senate | received in Senate |
2016-02-09 | House | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2016-02-04 | House | placed in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 9 |
2016-02-04 | House | taken from Rules (H) |
2016-02-04 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-02-03 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar Committee Substitute (1) |
2016-01-11 | House | posted in committee |
2016-01-05 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2016-01-05 | House | introduced in House |
2015-10-02 | House | Prefiled by the sponsor(s). |