KY HB54 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-23 - to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-23 - to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 209 to prohibit persons convicted of a felony under that chapter from serving in any capacity that has authority over the victim of the offense or the victim's estate.
Title
AN ACT relating to trusts and estates.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-23 | to Judiciary (S) | |
2011-02-18 | received in Senate | |
2011-02-18 | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 with floor amendment (1) | |
2011-02-17 | floor amendment (1) filed | |
2011-02-17 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 18, 2011 | |
2011-02-17 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2011-02-16 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | |
2011-02-07 | posted in committee | |
2011-01-04 | to Judiciary (H) | |
2011-01-04 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB54.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB54/bill.doc |