KY HB538 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-28 - to Health & Welfare (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-28 - to Health & Welfare (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 620.030 to require investigations of reports of child abuse or neglect allegedly committed by a child; amend KRS 620.040 to require investigations of reports of child abuse or neglect allegedly committed by a child; amend KRS 620.030 to establish new requirements when a specific emergency custody order is issued.
Title
AN ACT relating to child abuse and neglect.
Sponsors
Rep. Linda Belcher [D] | Rep. George Brown [D] | Rep. Kelly Flood [D] | Rep. Joni Jenkins [D] |
Rep. Dennis Keene [D] | Rep. Martha King [D] | Rep. Mary Marzian [D] | Rep. Rita Smart [D] |
Rep. Susan Westrom [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-28 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2016-03-23 | Senate | received in Senate |
2016-03-22 | House | 3rd reading, passed 89-6 |
2016-03-11 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2016-03-11 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 14, 2016 |
2016-03-11 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-10 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2016-03-04 | House | posted in committee |
2016-03-01 | House | to Health & Welfare (H) |
2016-02-29 | House | introduced in House |