KY HB537 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-29 - floor amendment (1-title) and (2) filed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-29 - floor amendment (1-title) and (2) filed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend 164.540 to authorize the Council on Postsecondary Education to enter into the State Authorization Reciprocity Agreement, for the purpose of authorizing a postsecondary institution located in another state to provide distance education to Kentucky residents; serve as the lead or "portal" agency responsible for contact with other states on matters pertaining to interstate reciprocity agreements; promulgate administrative regulations.
Title
AN ACT relating to interstate distance education among postsecondary institutions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | Senate | floor amendment (1-title) and (2) filed |
2016-03-29 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a Consent Bill |
2016-03-28 | Senate | returned to Education (S) |
2016-03-28 | Senate | 1st reading |
2016-03-28 | Senate | taken from Education (S) |
2016-03-16 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2016-03-14 | Senate | received in Senate |
2016-03-11 | House | 3rd reading, passed 93-0 |
2016-03-09 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 11, 2016 |
2016-03-09 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-08 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2016-03-04 | House | posted in committee |
2016-03-01 | House | to Education (H) |
2016-02-29 | House | introduced in House |