KY HB528 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 198)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 403.270 to create a presumption that joint custody and equally shared parenting time is in the best interrest of the child, and to require the court to consider the motiviation of the aduts involved when determining the best interest of the child for custody orders; amend KRS 403.280 to specify that the presumption of joint custody and equal parenting time is in the best interest of the child; amend KRS 403.320 to allow a parent not granted custody or shared parenting time to petition for reasonable visitation rights; amend KRS 403.340 to specify that if a court modifies a custody decree there is a rebuttable presumption that it is in the best interest of the child for the parents to have joint custody and equally shared parenting time.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to joint custody.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-13 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 498 (Y: 81 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SCS 1, SFA 1 RSN# 710 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 355 (Y: 83 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-26Housesigned by Governor (Acts, ch. 198)
2018-04-14Housedelivered to Governor
2018-04-14Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2018-04-14Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2018-04-13HouseBill passed 81-2
2018-04-13HouseHouse concurred in Senate Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (1)
2018-04-13Houseposted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute and floor amendment (1)
2018-04-13Houseto Rules (H)
2018-04-13Housereceived in House
2018-04-13Senate3rd reading, passed 38-0 with Committee Substitute and floor amendment (1)
2018-04-13Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, April 13, 2018
2018-03-29Senatefloor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
2018-03-29Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2018-03-27Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2018-03-21Senateto Judiciary (S)
2018-03-20Senatereceived in Senate
2018-03-19House3rd reading, passed 83-1
2018-03-16Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 19, 2018
2018-03-15House2nd reading, to Rules
2018-03-14Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2018-03-01Houseposted in committee
2018-02-28Houseto Judiciary (H)
2018-02-26Houseintroduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback