KY HB527 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 147)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS 199.800 to 199.805 to provide that the Department for Community Based Services shall place a foster child within the school district where the child was enrolled immediately prior to placement if practicable; require the department to make the determination on whether a foster child shall remain enrolled in the school of origin based upon a determination of the best interest of the child; provide that the cost of transportation shall not be a factor in the determination of the best interest of the child; require reasonable transportation to be offered if the department determines it is in the best interest of the child to remain enrolled in the school of origin after placement in a new school district; establish procedures for enrolling a foster child if changing the child's school of enrollment is in the best interest of the child; require the district in which the foster child is enrolled upon successful completion of high school graduation requirements to issue a diploma to the child.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to the educational stability of children in out-of-home placements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 686 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 304 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-10Housesigned by Governor (Acts, ch. 147)
2018-03-29Housedelivered to Governor
2018-03-29Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2018-03-29Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2018-03-29Housereceived in House
2018-03-29Senate3rd reading, passed 37-0
2018-03-27Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 29, 2018
2018-03-22Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2018-03-21Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2018-03-16Senateto Health & Welfare (S)
2018-03-15Senatereceived in Senate
2018-03-14House3rd reading, passed 95-0 with Committee Substitute
2018-03-13Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 14, 2018
2018-03-09House2nd reading, to Rules
2018-03-08Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute
2018-03-06Houseposted in committee
2018-02-28Houseto Health and Family Services (H)
2018-02-26Houseintroduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback