KY HB527 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-7)
Status: Passed on April 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-11 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 124)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-7)
Status: Passed on April 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-11 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 124)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 210.410 to add primary care services to the list of services that community mental health centers shall provide; and create a new section of KRS Chapter 205 to require that primary care services provided by physicians, advanced practice registered nurses, and physician assistants in community mental health centers are Medicaid-reimbursable at the same rates set for primary care centers, require the cabinet to promulgate administrative regulations, and define terms.
Title
AN ACT relating to community mental health centers.
Sponsors
Rep. John Tilley [D] | Rep. Thomas Burch [D] | Rep. Mitchel Denham [D] | Rep. Myron Dossett [R] |
Rep. David Floyd [R] | Rep. Mike Harmon [R] | Rep. Kenny Imes [R] | Rep. Joni Jenkins [D] |
Rep. Dennis Keene [D] | Rep. Martha King [D] | Rep. Mary Marzian [D] | Rep. Reginald Meeks [D] |
Rep. Michael Meredith [R] | Rep. Terry Mills [D] | Rep. Steven Riggs [D] | Rep. Kevin Sinnette [D] |
Rep. Fitz Steele [D] | Rep. Wilson Stone [D] | Rep. Ben Waide [R] | Rep. Jim Wayne [D] |
Rep. Susan Westrom [D] | Rep. Brent Yonts [D] | Rep. Jill York [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-11 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 124) |
2014-03-31 | House | delivered to Governor |
2014-03-31 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2014-03-28 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2014-03-28 | House | received in House |
2014-03-27 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | committee amendments (1-title) and (2) withdrawn |
2014-03-27 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 27, 2014 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with committee amendments (1-title) and (2) as a Consent Bill |
2014-03-25 | Senate | returned to Health & Welfare (S) |
2014-03-25 | Senate | 1st reading |
2014-03-25 | Senate | taken from Health & Welfare (S) |
2014-03-25 | Senate | reassigned to Health & Welfare (S) |
2014-03-24 | Senate | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2014-03-20 | Senate | received in Senate |
2014-03-19 | House | 3rd reading, passed 95-3 with Committee Substitute, floor amendment (1) |
2014-03-17 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2014-03-14 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day |
2014-03-14 | House | taken from Rules |
2014-03-14 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-03-13 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2014-03-06 | House | posted in committee |
2014-03-05 | House | to Health & Welfare (H) |
2014-03-04 | House | introduced in House |