KY HB524 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on April 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 171)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on April 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-10 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 171)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 17.500 to include promoting human trafficking involving commercial sexual activity as a criminal offense against a minor if the victim is under 18; amend KRS 156.095 to require public schools to display the National Human Trafficking Reporting Hotline; amend KRS 176.415 to require the Department of Highways to post the hotline number of the National Human Trafficking Resource Center in all rest areas.
Title
AN ACT relating to the prevention of human trafficking.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 171) |
2017-03-30 | House | delivered to Governor |
2017-03-30 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2017-03-30 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2017-03-30 | House | Bill passed 94-0 |
2017-03-30 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title) |
2017-03-30 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title) |
2017-03-30 | House | to Rules (H) |
2017-03-30 | House | received in House |
2017-03-29 | Senate | passed 38-0 with Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title) |
2017-03-29 | Senate | floor amendments (1-title) and (2) withdrawn |
2017-03-29 | Senate | 3rd reading |
2017-03-29 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 29, 2017 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | floor amendment (1-title) filed to Bill and (2) filed to Committee Substitute |
2017-03-14 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title) as a Consent Bill |
2017-03-08 | Senate | returned to Judiciary (S) |
2017-03-08 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2017-03-08 | Senate | taken from Judiciary (S) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | returned to Judiciary (S) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | 1st reading |
2017-03-07 | Senate | taken from Judiciary (S) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2017-03-06 | Senate | received in Senate |
2017-03-03 | House | 3rd reading, passed 81-0 |
2017-02-24 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day |
2017-02-23 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 24, 2017 |
2017-02-23 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-02-22 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2017-02-21 | House | posted in committee |
2017-02-21 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2017-02-17 | House | introduced in House |