KY HB521 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-28 - to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-28 - to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 132 to exempt property used in the deployment of advanced broadband technologies from state and local ad valorem tax for tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2018, but prior to January 1, 2022; amend KRS 132.010 to define property used in the deployment of advanced broadband technologies; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to exempting property used in the deployment of advanced broadband technologies from state and local ad valorem taxation and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-28 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2018-02-26 | House | introduced in House |