KY HB511 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 156)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 156)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
The Legislative Branch Budget: appropriate from the General Fund $51,658,700 for fiscal year 2010-2011 and $54,343,500 for fiscal year 2011-2012; appropriate from Restricted Funds $53,000 for fiscal year 2010-2011 and $119,300 for fiscal year 2011-2012;
Title
AN ACT making appropriations for the operations, maintenance, and support of the Legislative Branch of the Commonwealth of Kentucky.
Sponsors
Rep. Rocky Adkins [D] | Rep. Larry Clark [D] | Rep. Robert Damron [D] | Rep. Rick Rand [D] |
Rep. John Stacy [D] | Rep. Gregory Stumbo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 156) | |
2010-04-01 | delivered to Governor | |
2010-04-01 | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer | |
2010-04-01 | Bill passed 81-16 | |
2010-04-01 | Conference Committee report adopted in House | |
2010-04-01 | Bill passed 34-2 | |
2010-04-01 | Conference Committee report adopted in Senate | |
2010-04-01 | Conference Committee report filed in House and Senate | |
2010-03-24 | Conference Committee appointed in House | |
2010-03-23 | Conference Committee appointed in Senate | |
2010-03-23 | Senate refused to recede from Committee Substitute | |
2010-03-23 | posted for passage for receding from Senate Committee Substitute | |
2010-03-23 | received in Senate | |
2010-03-23 | House refused to concur in Senate Committee Substitute | |
2010-03-23 | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute for Tuesday, March 23, 2010 | |
2010-03-22 | to Rules (H) | |
2010-03-22 | received in House | |
2010-03-22 | 3rd reading, passed 35-3 with Committee Substitute | |
2010-03-22 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 22, 2010 | |
2010-03-22 | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute | |
2010-03-12 | 2nd reading | |
2010-03-12 | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S) | |
2010-03-12 | taken from committee | |
2010-03-11 | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) | |
2010-03-11 | returned to Committee on Committees (S) | |
2010-03-11 | 1st reading | |
2010-03-11 | taken from committee | |
2010-03-11 | received in Senate | |
2010-03-10 | 3rd reading, passed 97-1 with Committee Substitute | |
2010-03-10 | floor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute | |
2010-03-09 | taken from Rules Committee, placed in the Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 10, 2010 | |
2010-03-09 | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute | |
2010-03-09 | floor amendment (1) filed | |
2010-03-02 | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | |
2010-03-02 | 2nd reading | |
2010-03-02 | taken from committee | |
2010-03-01 | posted in committee | |
2010-03-01 | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | |
2010-03-01 | 1st reading | |
2010-03-01 | taken from committee | |
2010-02-26 | posted in committee | |
2010-02-26 | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | |
2010-02-25 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB511.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB511/bill.doc |