KY HB510 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Vetoed on April 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-06 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 127)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #5) [MS Word]
Status: Vetoed on April 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-06 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 127)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #5) [MS Word]
Summary
Make technical corrections.
Title
AN ACT amending the 2014-2016 executive branch biennial budget, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Rand [D] | Rep. Mitchel Denham [D] | Rep. Thomas McKee [D] | Rep. Steven Rudy [R] |
Rep. Wilson Stone [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-06 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 127) |
2015-04-06 | House | line items vetoed |
2015-03-25 | House | delivered to Governor |
2015-03-25 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2015-03-25 | House | Bill passed 96-3 |
2015-03-25 | House | Free Conference Committee report adopted in House |
2015-03-25 | House | received in House |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Bill passed 37-0 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Free Conference Committee report adopted in Senate |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Free Conference Committee report filed in House and Senate |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Free Conference Committee appointed in House and Senate |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Conference Committee report adopted in House and Senate |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Conference Committee report filed in House and Senate |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Conference Committee appointed in Senate |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Senate refused to recede from Committee Substitute (2) |
2015-03-11 | Senate | passed over |
2015-03-11 | Senate | posted for passage for receding from Senate Committee Substitute (2) |
2015-03-11 | Senate | to Rules (S) |
2015-03-11 | Senate | received in Senate |
2015-03-11 | House | Conference Committee tentatively appointed in House |
2015-03-11 | House | House refused to concur in Senate Committee Substitute (2) |
2015-03-11 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute (2) |
2015-03-11 | House | to Rules (H) |
2015-03-11 | House | received in House |
2015-03-11 | Senate | passed 36-0 with Committee Substitute (2) |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Committee Substitute withdrawn |
2015-03-11 | Senate | 3rd reading |
2015-03-11 | Senate | placed in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2015-03-11 | Senate | taken from the Regular Orders of the Day |
2015-03-11 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 11, 2015 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (2) as a Consent Bill |
2015-03-11 | Senate | recommitted to Agriculture (S) |
2015-03-11 | Senate | taken from Rules (S) |
2015-03-10 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute as a Consent Bill |
2015-03-09 | Senate | to Agriculture (S) |
2015-03-04 | Senate | returned to Committee on Committees (S) |
2015-03-04 | Senate | 1st reading |
2015-03-04 | Senate | taken from Committee on Committees (S) |
2015-03-04 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2015-03-04 | Senate | received in Senate |
2015-03-03 | House | 3rd reading, passed with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title), floor amendment (1) |
2015-03-03 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2015-02-27 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 2, 2015 |
2015-02-27 | House | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) |
2015-02-26 | House | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2015-02-26 | House | 2nd reading |
2015-02-26 | House | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2015-02-25 | House | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2015-02-25 | House | 1st reading |
2015-02-25 | House | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2015-02-24 | House | posted in committee |
2015-02-24 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2015-02-23 | House | introduced in House |