KY HB51 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 2 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-02 - to State Government (H)
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Create new sections of KRS 6.500 to 6.577 to permit a member or retiree of the Legislators' Retirement Plan to opt out of the traditional defined benefit plan and elect to participate in the Kentucky Employees Retirement System's hybrid cash balance plan for nonhazardous employees under KRS 61.597; specify that, on the member's effective election date, the value of the active member's accumulated account balance or a lump-sum payment of the actuarial value of the retiree's benefits be deposited into the member's hybrid cash balance account and be considered part of the member's accumulated account balance in the Kentucky Employees Retirement System; specify that on an active member's effective election date, an employer pay credit shall be applied to the member's accumulated account balance for each contributing month prior to the effective election date; require the Judicial Form Retirement System and the Kentucky Retirement Systems to provide the electing member with information detailing the consequences of the member's or retiree's election; specify that a member or retiree is not eligible to make an election until a private letter ruling by the IRS is received; make the benefit election under this section irrevocable; amend KRS 6.505 to close the Legislators' Retirement Plan to new members effective August 1, 2018, and transfer all legislative members' in the hybrid cash balance plan to the hybrid cash balance plan in the Kentucky Employees Retirement System; make conforming amendments to KRS 21.374, 21.402, and 61.597; amend KRS 141.010 and 141.020 to provide that, effective for taxable years on or after January 1, 2019, members and retirees of the Legislators' Retirement Plan who do not opt out of the traditional defined benefit plan and elect to participate in the Kentucky Employees Retirement System's hybrid cash balance plan have any retirement distributions exceeding $80,000 taxed at a rate of 75%.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to retirement benefits for legislators.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-02Houseto State Government (H)
2018-01-02Houseintroduced in House
2017-10-20HousePrefiled by the sponsor(s).

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback