KY HB503 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-26 - to State Government (H)
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-26 - to State Government (H)
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 18A to require the Personnel Cabinet to develop a tiered system based on salary for state employee premiums for dependent coverage; require the cabinet to ensure single coverage is not affected; require the cabinet to report to the Legislative Research Commission by October 1, 2010; require the cabinet to implement tiers beginning January 1, 2011.
Title
AN ACT relating to state employee health insurance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-26 | to State Government (H) | |
2010-02-25 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB503.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB503/bill.doc |