KY HB5 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-13 - to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-13 - to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 45A to define terms; create a new section of KRS Chapter 45A relating to public agencies to, on and after January 1, 2013, require use of federal employment verification programs and prohibit hiring of unauthorized aliens by contractors with public agencies; create a new section of KRS Chapter 45A relating to complaints and penalties for contractor hiring unauthorized aliens, including a ban on future state contracts for designated periods; create a new section of KRS Chapter 337 to define terms; create a new section of KRS Chapter 337 to, on and after January 1, 2013, require all public agencies to use the federal E-Verify program for hiring new public employees; create a new section of KRS Chapter 65 to prohibit local governments from attempting to restrict the use of the provisions of the Act; create a noncodified section permitting agencies to implement the required programs after the effective date of the Act and prior to the January 1, 2013, implementation date.
Title
AN ACT relating to hiring unauthorized aliens.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Damron [D] | Rep. Dennis Keene [D] | Rep. Martha King [D] | Rep. Brad Montell [R] |
Rep. Rick Nelson [D] | Rep. David Osborne [R] | Rep. John Short [D] | Rep. Fitz Steele [D] |
Rep. Susan Westrom [D] | Rep. Brent Yonts [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-13 | to Judiciary (S) | |
2012-02-09 | received in Senate | |
2012-02-08 | 3rd reading, passed 93-4 | |
2012-02-06 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 7, 2012 | |
2012-02-06 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2012-02-02 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | |
2012-01-27 | posted in committee | |
2012-01-25 | to Labor & Industry (H) | |
2012-01-24 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB5.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB5/bill.doc |