KY HB498 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-22 - to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-22 - to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 403.725, relating to domestic violence, to make gender-neutral.
Title
AN ACT relating to domestic violence.
Sponsors
Rep. John Tilley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-22 | to Judiciary (S) | |
2012-03-20 | received in Senate | |
2012-03-19 | 3rd reading, passed 87-6 with Committee Substitute | |
2012-03-15 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 19, 2012 | |
2012-03-15 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2012-03-14 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute | |
2012-03-08 | posted in committee | |
2012-02-29 | to Judiciary (H) | |
2012-02-28 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB498.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HB498/bill.doc |