KY HB49 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 083)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 132.017, relating to property taxes levied by local government entities, to extend the deadline to file a petition to 75 days; allow petition papers to be substantially uniform in size and style; allow the names of voters from more than one voting precinct to be on the same sheet of the petition paper; allow electronic signatures to be counted when the signatures comply with the Uniform Electronic Transactions Act; lower the number of signatures needed for the petition to 5%; require the local governmental entity or school to levy a tax rate that is equal to the compensating tax rate when an election on the tax rate levy is canceled or the vote fails to pass the election; amend KRS 132.018 to conform.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to the levy of property taxes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 317 (Y: 72 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/sfa 1 RSN# 942 (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 140 (Y: 69 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25Housesigned by Governor (KY Acts ch. 083)
2019-03-14Housedelivered to Governor
2019-03-14Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2019-03-13Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2019-03-13Housepassed 72-22
2019-03-13HouseHouse concurred in Senate floor amendment (1)
2019-03-13Houseposted for passage for concurrence in Senate floor amendment (1)
2019-03-13Housetaken from Rules
2019-03-12Houseto Rules (H)
2019-03-12Housereceived in House
2019-03-12Senatepassed 29-8 with floor amendment (1)
2019-03-12Senatefloor amendment (2) withdrawn
2019-03-12Senate3rd reading
2019-03-07Senatefloor amendment (1) and (2) filed
2019-03-07Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2019-03-07Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 7, 2019
2019-03-06Senatereported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules
2019-03-05Senatereturned to State & Local Government (S)
2019-03-05Senate1st reading
2019-03-05Senatetaken from State & Local Government (S)
2019-03-01Senateto State & Local Government (S)
2019-02-27Senatereceived in Senate
2019-02-26House3rd reading, passed 69-28 with Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (1)
2019-02-25Housefloor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute
2019-02-22Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 25, 2019
2019-02-21House2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-20Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2019-02-05Houseposted in committee
2019-01-10Houseto Local Government (H)
2019-01-08Houseintroduced in House
2018-12-14HousePrefiled by the sponsor(s).

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback