KY HB487 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - became law without Governor's Signature (Acts, ch. 207)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 337.055 to insert gender-neutral language.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to tax credits and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 516 (Y: 51 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-04-14 - House - House: Concur SCS 1 RCS# 515 (Y: 46 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SCS 1, SCTA 1 RSN# 765 (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 359 (Y: 74 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-27Housebecame law without Governor's Signature (Acts, ch. 207)
2018-04-26Housefiled without Governor's signature with the Secretary of State
2018-04-14Housedelivered to Governor
2018-04-14Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2018-04-14Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2018-04-14HouseBill passed 51-38
2018-04-14HouseHouse concurred in Senate Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title)
2018-04-14Houseposted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title)
2018-04-14Housetaken from Rules
2018-04-14Houseto Rules (H)
2018-04-14Housereceived in House
2018-04-14Senate3rd reading, passed 24-14 with Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title)
2018-04-14Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Saturday, April 14, 2018
2018-04-14Senatereported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title)
2018-03-22Senatereturned to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
2018-03-22Senate2nd reading
2018-03-22Senatetaken from Appropriations & Revenue (S)
2018-03-21Senateto Appropriations & Revenue (S)
2018-03-21Senatereturned to Committee on Committees (S)
2018-03-21Senate1st reading
2018-03-21Senatetaken from Committee on Committees (S)
2018-03-20Senatereceived in Senate
2018-03-19House3rd reading, passed 74-11 with Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title)
2018-03-16Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 19, 2018
2018-03-15House2nd reading, to Rules
2018-03-14Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute & committee amendment (1-title)
2018-03-12Houseposted in committee
2018-02-28Houseto Economic Development & Workforce Investment (H)
2018-02-26Houseintroduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback