KY HB487 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-09 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 72)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-09 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 72)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 40.305 to require that two members of the Governor's Advisory Board for Veterans' Affairs be recommended by the Joint Executive Council of Veterans Organizations of Kentucky.
Title
AN ACT relating to the Governor's Advisory Board for Veterans' Affairs.
Sponsors
Rep. Kenny Imes [R] | Rep. Will Coursey [D] | Rep. Linda Belcher [D] | Rep. Tim Moore [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-09 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 72) |
2016-03-29 | House | delivered to Governor |
2016-03-29 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2016-03-29 | House | received in House |
2016-03-28 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 |
2016-03-28 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 28, 2016 (Consent Orders #1) |
2016-03-25 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-24 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2016-03-17 | Senate | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2016-03-15 | Senate | received in Senate |
2016-03-14 | House | 3rd reading, passed 94-0 |
2016-03-10 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 14, 2016 |
2016-03-10 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-09 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2016-03-08 | House | posting waived |
2016-02-25 | House | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Safety (H) |
2016-02-24 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/HB487.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/HB487/bill.pdf |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/HB487/vote_history.pdf |