KY HB482 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 176)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 176)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 15.440 to allow the Kentucky Law Enforcement Council, through the promulgation of administrative regulations, to approve basic training credit for the basic training for the Kentucky Law Enforcement Foundation Program fund stipend and Peace Officer Professional Standards basic training years for service credit served in another state or basic training completed in another state.
Title
AN ACT relating to law enforcement training.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 176) |
2017-03-30 | House | delivered to Governor |
2017-03-30 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2017-03-30 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2017-03-30 | House | passed 90-0 |
2017-03-30 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title) |
2017-03-30 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title) |
2017-03-30 | House | to Rules (H) |
2017-03-30 | House | received in House |
2017-03-30 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 with Committee Substitute and committee amendment (1-title) |
2017-03-30 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 30, 2017 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with committee amendment (1-title) and Committee Substitute |
2017-03-29 | Senate | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2017-03-29 | Senate | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day |
2017-03-29 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 29, 2017 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2017-03-08 | Senate | returned to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2017-03-08 | Senate | 1st reading |
2017-03-08 | Senate | taken from Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2017-03-06 | Senate | received in Senate |
2017-03-03 | House | 3rd reading, passed 94-1 |
2017-03-01 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day |
2017-02-27 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday March 1, 2017 |
2017-02-27 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2017-02-24 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2017-02-22 | House | posted in committee |
2017-02-21 | House | to Veterans, Military Affairs, and Public Protection (H) |
2017-02-17 | House | introduced in House |