KY HB477 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-24 - to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-24 - to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS Chapter 337 to set forth legislative findings and declarations regarding employee misclassification problems; provide definitions; set forth determination of misclassified workers; set forth investigation process and violations; establish court remedies; require notice by an employer; grant commissioner authority to promulgate administrative regulations; require agencies to share the information of a misclassifying employer with other interested state agencies; amend KRS 337.990 to establish penalties for violations; amend KRS 45A.485 to prohibit contractors with multiple violations from contracting with the state for two years; amend KRS 131.190 to require the Department of Revenue to provide copies of assessments for failure to pay income tax to three other state agencies; create a new section of KRS Chapter 341 to require the Office of Employment and Training to provide copies of assessments for failure to pay income tax to three other state agencies; create a new section of KRS Chapter 342 to require the commissioner to provide copies of orders to three other state agencies.
Title
AN ACT relating to misclassification of employees in the construction industry.
Sponsors
Rep. Sannie Overly [D] | Rep. Gregory Stumbo [D] | Rep. Larry Clark [D] | Rep. Jeffery Donohue [D] |
Rep. Dennis Horlander [D] | Rep. Mary Marzian [D] | Rep. Steven Riggs [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-24 | Senate | to Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S) |
2016-03-23 | Senate | received in Senate |
2016-03-22 | House | 3rd reading, passed 77-20 with Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (8) |
2016-03-11 | House | floor amendments (4) (5) and (6) withdrawn |
2016-03-11 | House | floor amendment (8) filed to Committee Substitute |
2016-03-07 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 8, 2016 |
2016-03-04 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-03 | House | and (4), (5), and (6) filed to Committee Substitute |
2016-03-03 | House | floor amendments (1), (2), (3), and (7-title) filed to Bill |
2016-03-03 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2016-02-26 | House | posted in committee |
2016-02-24 | House | to Labor & Industry (H) |
2016-02-23 | House | introduced in House |