KY HB469 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-08 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-08 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 67.060 to specify that voters required to sign a candidate's filing form shall be voters residing in the candidate's district; amend KRS 83A.170 to delete language relating to a voter signing multiple petitions of nomination in nonpartisan primaries; amend KRS 118.105 to specify that a disqualified candidate is not eligible to fill a vacancy in candidacy and that if a vacancy in candidacy occurs in a race with an unopposed candidate that the opposite party may nominate a candidate; amend KRS 118.125, 118.315, 118A.060, and 118A.100 to require that candidate and registered voters signing nomination papers include a legible, printed name and to specify that failure to include a legible name results in the signature not being counted; amend KRS 118.591 to conform; amend KRS 160.190 to require that vacancy in board of education position with unexpired term of one (1) year or more be placed on ballot for write-in voting if no candidate files a petition of nomination for the vacancy; amend KRS 160.210 to conform; amend KRS 160.220 to govern filing and vote certification procedures in school districts whose boundaries extend beyond a single county; make provisions related to nomination papers effective November 1, 2011.
Title
AN ACT relating to elections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-08 | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | |
2011-03-08 | taken from Rules (H) | |
2011-03-02 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2011-03-01 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | |
2011-02-17 | posted in committee | |
2011-02-15 | to Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H) | |
2011-02-14 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB469.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB469/bill.doc |