KY HB465 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 86)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 86)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 304.17A-173 to require the same reimbursement to optometrists for the same services rendered by a physician or osteopath; prohibit an insurer from requiring additional terms and conditions for an optometrist that are not required of a physician or osteopath to participate in the provider network for services within the scope of practice of an optometrist and require the same for a health benefit plan; prohibit an insurer from requiring an optometrist, physician, or osteopath from participation in the health care network if they do not participate in a vision care plan licensed under Subtitle 17C of KRS Chapter 304.
Title
AN ACT relating to insurance contracting standards for eye health care.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Greer [D] | Rep. Dennis Keene [D] | Rep. Dwight Butler [R] | Rep. Leslie Combs [D] |
Rep. Richard Heath [R] | Rep. Kenny Imes [R] | Rep. Russ Meyer [D] | Rep. Tim Moore [R] |
Rep. Ruth Palumbo [D] | Rep. Dean Schamore [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-30 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 86) |
2015-03-24 | House | delivered to Governor |
2015-03-24 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2015-03-24 | House | received in House |
2015-03-23 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2015-03-10 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2015-03-10 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 10, 2015 |
2015-03-09 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-03-04 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2015-03-03 | Senate | to Banking & Insurance (S) |
2015-03-02 | Senate | received in Senate |
2015-02-27 | House | 3rd reading, passed 91-0 |
2015-02-26 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 27, 2015 |
2015-02-26 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 27, 2015 |
2015-02-25 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a Consent Bill |
2015-02-24 | House | returned to Banking & Insurance (H) |
2015-02-24 | House | 1st reading |
2015-02-24 | House | taken from Banking & Insurance (H) |
2015-02-23 | House | posted in committee |
2015-02-23 | House | to Banking & Insurance (H) |
2015-02-13 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/HB465.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/HB465/bill.doc |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/HB465/vote_history.pdf |