KY HB464 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 4 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-16 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Enrolled on March 4 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-16 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 156 to require the Kentucky Board of Education to promulgate administrative regulations to establish procedures for reviewing and resolving claims of factual errors found in textbooks after adoption by the State Textbook Commission.
Title
AN ACT relating to the correction of factual errors in state-adopted textbooks.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-16 | signed by Governor | |
2011-03-04 | delivered to Governor | |
2011-03-04 | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer | |
2011-03-04 | received in House | |
2011-03-04 | 3rd reading, passed 36-1 | |
2011-03-03 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 4, 2011 | |
2011-03-03 | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a Consent Bill | |
2011-03-02 | returned to Education (S) | |
2011-03-02 | 1st reading | |
2011-03-02 | taken from Education (S) | |
2011-03-01 | to Education (S) | |
2011-02-25 | received in Senate | |
2011-02-24 | 3rd reading, passed 100-0 | |
2011-02-23 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 24, 2011 | |
2011-02-23 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2011-02-22 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2011-02-17 | posted in committee | |
2011-02-14 | to Education (H) | |
2011-02-11 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB464.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB464/bill.doc |