KY HB463 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-03 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 2)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [MS Word]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS Chapter 532 to establish the sentencing policy of the Commonwealth; create a new section of KRS Chapter 196 to declare the primary objectives of the Department of Corrections; amend KRS 446.010 to add pertinent definitions; create a new section of KRS 218A to declare findings of the General Assembly regarding controlled substances and treatment; amend various sections of KRS Chapter 218A, relating to controlled substances, to define quantities and to otherwise modify elements of offenses and penalties; create a new section of KRS Chapter 218A to provide for pretrial release; create a new section of KRS Chapter 218A to allow deferred prosecution for possession cases; amend KRS 218A.275 and 218A.276 to permit risk and needs assessments for treatment and expungement of misdemeanor possession cases upon successful completion of treatment; create new sections of KRS Chapter 196 requiring the Department of Corrections to analyze savings from controlled substance modifications and use the savings for treatment, other evidence-based programs, and to expand programs at underused existing facilities; create a new section of KRS Chapter 26A, relating to the Court of Justice, to require the Supreme Court to administer a drug court program; amend KRS 532.080 to specify offenses to which persistent felony offender applies; amend KRS 197.020 to require the department to use a risk and needs assessment; amend KRS 439.3405 to clarify the circumstances for medical release from prison; amend and create various sections of KRS 439.250 to 439.560, relating to probation and parole, to require the use of risk and needs assessments, modify provisions relating to parole hearings, conditions, and deferment, and to require mandatory reentry supervision and postincarceration supervision; amend KRS 532.050, relating to presentence procedure, to require consideration of a risk and needs assessment; create a new section of KRS 439.250 to 439.560 to permit the Department of Correction to implement conditional parole of specified inmates to jails; amend KRS 532.100 to permit specified Class D felons to serve sentences at county jails; create a new section of KRS 439.250 to 439.560 to allow approval of any housing option for parolees that fulfills statutory requirements; create a new section of KRS 439.250 to 439.560 to specify approval of housing options for prisoners on parole or conditional release; amend KRS 532.260, relating to home incarceration, to add conditional release and allow for persons with 9 months or less to serve; create a new section of KRS Chapter 27A to require the Supreme Court to create guidelines for judges to use when considering pretrial release and monitored conditional release; create a new section of KRS Chapter 431 to allow requiring those on pretrial release to use GPS monitoring; amend KRS 431.015 to allow an officer to issue a citation instead of an arrest for specified misdemeanors; amend KRS 431.525 to set a maximum bail not to exceed the amount of fine and court costs for specified crimes; create a new section of KRS Chapter 431 to establish pretrial release and considerations for persons based on risk of flight and danger before trial and require credit toward bail based on time spent in jail before trial; create a new section of KRS Chapter 27A to require the Supreme Court to use evidence-based programs; create a new section of KRS Chapter 196 to require the Department of Corrections to promulgate regulations regarding the use of evidence-based practices for treatment and supervision programs; create new sections of KRS 439.250 to 439.560 to require the Department of Corrections to use evidence-based practices for treatment and supervision programs and to train their employees in the implementation and use of those practices, report on the efforts to implement evidence-based practices, administer a risk and needs assessment upon entry into community supervision and at regular intervals, permit parolees to receive compliance credits, develop a system of graduated sanctions and related procedures, permit modification of probation, establish an administrative caseload supervision program, and require sanctions for failure to comply with conditions of supervision; create a new section of KRS Chapter 27A to require the Chief Justice to submit annual reports detailing various court statistics; amend KRS 196.031 to require additional information in the Justice Cabinet's report; create a new section of KRS Chapter 196 to require the Department of Corrections to create an online database with specified sentencing information; create new sections of KRS Chapter 196 to require the Department of Corrections to calculate savings from the new provisions and require savings to go into a fund; amend various sections of KRS Chapter 196 to permit the department to create community corrections pilot projects, require report, and to establish a fund; create new section of KRS Chapter 6, relating to the General Assembly, to require more information on fiscal impact statements; amend KRS 441.045 and 441.053 to require the use of the Medicaid rate in billing for jail prisoner medical and related costs; create and amend various other sections in KRS Chapter 441 to require a certificate of need before building a new local correctional facility; amend KRS 533.010 to require the court to consider a defendant's risk and needs assessment before sentencing; create a new section of KRS Chapter 534 to provide a credit for time spent in jail to apply to fines and costs; amend various sections of KRS Chapter 439 to make persons on postincarceration supervision subject to the authority of the Parole Board; amend KRS 532.043, relating to conditional discharge for sex offenses, to modify the supervision to postincarceration supervision and specify that persons on postincarceration supervision are subject to the authority of the Parole Board; provide for the implementation of a pilot project to supervise high-risk probationers; make an appropriation to the department to improve the Kentucky Offender Management System; amend various other sections to conform; EMERGENCY and DELAYED EFFECTIVE DATES.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to the criminal justice system, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-03 signed by Governor (Acts ch. 2)
2011-03-01 delivered to Governor
2011-03-01 enrolled, signed by each presiding officer
2011-02-28 passed 96-1
2011-02-28 House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute
2011-02-28 posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute
2011-02-28 received in House
2011-02-28 passed 38-0 with Committee Substitute
2011-02-28 floor amendments (1) and (2) withdrawn
2011-02-28 3rd reading
2011-02-28 posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 28, 2011
2011-02-24 reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute
2011-02-23 floor amendment (2) filed
2011-02-23 to Judiciary (S)
2011-02-23 returned to Committee on Committees (S)
2011-02-23 2nd reading
2011-02-23 taken from Committee on Committees (S)
2011-02-22 floor amendment (1) filed
2011-02-22 returned to Committee on Committees (S)
2011-02-22 1st reading
2011-02-22 taken from Committee on Committees (S)
2011-02-18 received in Senate
2011-02-17 3rd reading, passed 97-2 with Committee Substitute, floor amendment (3)
2011-02-17 floor amendment (3) filed to Committee Substitute
2011-02-16 floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute, floor amendment (2) filed
2011-02-16 posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 17, 2011
2011-02-16 reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1)
2011-02-15 returned to Judiciary (H)
2011-02-15 2nd reading
2011-02-15 taken from Judiciary (H)
2011-02-14 returned to Judiciary (H)
2011-02-14 1st reading
2011-02-14 taken from Judiciary (H)
2011-02-14 posting waived
2011-02-14 to Judiciary (H)
2011-02-11 introduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback