KY HB46 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - 2nd reading, to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS Chapter 18A to allow full-time employees of the Commonwealth of Kentucky a paid leave of absence of 240 hours for donating a human organ and 40 hours for donating bone marrow and to set requirements for the paid leave of absence; amend KRS 141.010 to define "human organ" and "qualified organ donation expenses"; amend KRS 18A.025 and 18A.110 to conform; amend KRS 141.019 to allow a tax deduction in an amount equal to the qualified organ donation expenses incurred by a taxpayer up to $10,000 and require reporting by the Department of Revenue; amend KRS 131.190 to allow the Kentucky Department of Revenue to report organ donation tax deduction data to the Legislative Research Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to the promotion of living donor human organ and bone marrow donation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 173 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-19Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2020-03-18Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2020-03-10Senateto Health & Welfare (S)
2020-03-05Senatereceived in Senate
2020-03-04House3rd reading, passed 94-0 with Committee Substitute (1)
2020-03-02Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 3, 2020
2020-02-27Housereported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1)
2020-02-26Houseposting waived
2020-02-26Housereassigned to State Government (H)
2020-01-22Houserecommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2020-01-22Housetaken from the Regular Orders of the Day
2020-01-21Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, January 22, 2020
2020-01-17House2nd reading, to Rules
2020-01-16Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2020-01-13Houseposted in committee
2020-01-07Houseto State Government (H)
2020-01-07Houseintroduced in House
2019-09-09HousePrefiled by the sponsor(s).

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback