KY HB46 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-30 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 41)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 367.365 to allow for security freezes to be requested by methods established by the consumer reporting agency; allow consumers to request a replacement personal identification number or password in the same manner as the original security freeze request; remove the expiration of a credit freeze after seven years; include gender-neutral language; EMERGENCY.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to credit freezes and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 563 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 61 (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-30Housesigned by Governor (Acts, ch. 41)
2018-03-20Housedelivered to Governor
2018-03-20Houseenrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2018-03-20Houseenrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2018-03-20Housereceived in House
2018-03-19Senate3rd reading, passed 38-0
2018-03-19Senateposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, March 19, 2018
2018-02-28Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2018-02-27Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2018-01-31Senateto Banking & Insurance (S)
2018-01-30Senatereceived in Senate
2018-01-29House3rd reading, passed 89-0 with Committee Substitute
2018-01-26Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, January 29, 2018
2018-01-25House2nd reading, to Rules
2018-01-24Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute
2018-01-18Houseposted in committee
2018-01-02Houseto Banking & Insurance (H)
2018-01-02Houseintroduced in House
2017-09-26HousePrefiled by the sponsor(s).

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback