KY HB457 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - reported favorably, to Rules as a consent bill
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

Amend the definition of "supervised individual" in KRS 439.250; amend KRS 439.3106 to create a new form of sanction to be applied by the Parole Board at final revocation hearings; provide that under a supervision continuation sanction, a sanctioned individual shall be returned to a jail, prison, halfway house, or inpatient treatment facility without revoking parole for up to nine months; reinstate the sanctioned individual to prior parole supervision conditions upon completion of the sanction, or return the individual to the parole board for revocation if the sanction is not successfully completed; amend KRS 439.3108 to allow probation and parole violators to have work release while in custody on discretionary detention.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to probation and parole supervision.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-16 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 329 (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-29Senatereported favorably, to Rules as a consent bill
2018-03-27Senatereturned to Judiciary (S)
2018-03-27Senate2nd reading
2018-03-27Senatetaken from Judiciary (S)
2018-03-22Senatereturned to Judiciary (S)
2018-03-22Senate1st reading
2018-03-22Senatetaken from Judiciary (S)
2018-03-20Senateto Judiciary (S)
2018-03-19Senatereceived in Senate
2018-03-16House3rd reading, passed 87-0
2018-03-15Houseposted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 16, 2018
2018-03-15House2nd reading, to Rules
2018-03-14Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2018-03-05Houseposted in committee
2018-02-27Houseto Judiciary (H)
2018-02-23Houseintroduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback