KY HB451 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - to Rules (H)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 15.241 to require the Attorney General, upon certification by the secretary of the Cabinet for Health and Family Services, to seek injunctive relief as well as civil or criminal penalties for violations of KRS Chapter 216B relating to abortion facilities and KRS 311.720 to 311.830 relating to abortions; provide that, in the absence of certification, the Attorney General may seek injunctive relief as well as civil or criminal penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to abortion.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1493 (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 208 (Y: 70 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-15Houseto Rules (H)
2020-04-15Housereceived in House
2020-04-15Senatepassed 31-2 with Committee Substitute (1), floor amendment (2) and committee amendment (1-title)
2020-04-15Senatefloor amendment (1) defeated
2020-04-15Senate3rd reading
2020-04-14Senatepassed over and retained in the Orders of the Day
2020-04-14Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, April 14, 2020
2020-04-01Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2020-03-26Senatefloor amendments (1) and (2) filed to Committee Substitute
2020-03-26Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) and committee amendment (1-title)
2020-03-17Senateto Judiciary (S)
2020-03-11Senatereceived in Senate
2020-03-10House3rd reading, passed 70-23 with Committee Substitute (1)
2020-03-09Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 10, 2020
2020-03-05House2nd reading, to Rules
2020-03-04Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1)
2020-02-24Houseposted in committee
2020-02-21Houseto Judiciary (H)
2020-02-19Houseintroduced in House

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback