KY HB441 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-03 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-03 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 620 to establish a statewide child fatality and near fatality external review panel and set out its membership and duties; amend KRS 620.020 to define "fatality," "near fatality," and "preventable fatality or near fatality"; amend KRS 620.050 to require data or information concerning reports and investigations concerning a child fatality or near fatality be made available to the public; establish parameters for the release of information; require the cabinet to promulgate administrative regulations to carry out the provisions related to the release of public information.
Title
AN ACT relating to the external statewide child fatality and near fatality review panel.
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Burch [D] | Rep. David Floyd [R] | Rep. Tom Riner [D] | Rep. Jim Wayne [D] |
Rep. Alecia Webb-Edgington [R] | Rep. Susan Westrom [D] | Rep. Addia Wuchner [R] | Rep. Jill York [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-03 | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | |
2011-03-01 | floor amendments (6) (7) and (8) filed | |
2011-02-23 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 24, 2011 | |
2011-02-22 | floor amendment (5) filed | |
2011-02-18 | floor amendment (4) filed | |
2011-02-18 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2011-02-17 | floor amendments (1) (2) and (3-title) filed | |
2011-02-17 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | |
2011-02-15 | posted in committee | |
2011-02-14 | to Health & Welfare (H) | |
2011-02-10 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB441.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/HB441/bill.doc |