KY HB44 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-08 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 89)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-08 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 89)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Create new sections of Subchapter 20 of KRS Chapter 224 to state the General Assembly's finding that reasonable standards for the remediation of mold in private and public settings should be maintained; define "customer," "department," "mold," "mold remediation," and "mold remediation company"; establish the basis for minimum mold remediation standards; provide that the Cabinet for Health and Family Services shall adopt administrative regulations relating to mold remediation standards; require complaints about mold remediation companies to be directed to the Attorney General; establish that the Attorney General has jurisdiction to enforce the mold remediation provisions and the ability to recover litigation costs.
Title
AN ACT relating to mold remediation standards.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Damron [D] | Rep. Tom Riner [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-08 | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 89) | |
2010-03-29 | delivered to Governor | |
2010-03-29 | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer | |
2010-03-29 | passed 100-0 | |
2010-03-29 | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute | |
2010-03-29 | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute for Monday, March 29, 2010 | |
2010-03-29 | taken from Rules Committee | |
2010-03-26 | to Rules (H) | |
2010-03-26 | received in House | |
2010-03-26 | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 with Committee Substitute | |
2010-03-25 | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day | |
2010-03-24 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 25, 2010 | |
2010-03-17 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-03-16 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute | |
2010-03-08 | to Licensing, Occupations & Administrative Regulations (S) | |
2010-03-04 | received in Senate | |
2010-03-03 | 3rd reading, passed 97-2 | |
2010-02-25 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 3, 2010 | |
2010-02-25 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-02-24 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2010-02-22 | posted in committee | |
2010-01-05 | to Military Affairs & Public Safety (H) | |
2010-01-05 | introduced in House | |
2010-11-04 | To: Interim Joint Committee on Health and Welfare |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB44.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB44/bill.doc |