KY HB436 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 18, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 18, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 210.365 to make firefighters eligible for crisis intervention team training along with law enforcement officers currently permitted such training; amend KRS 95A.220 with an appropriation of $1,250,000 each fiscal year for treatment of full-time and volunteer firefighters affected by post-traumatic stress injury (PTSI) and/or post-traumatic stress disorder (PTSD); allow no PTSD eligibility for disability retirement; declare legitimate personnel actions not compensable, diagnosis required by psychiatrist, psychologist or counselor; APPROPRIATION.
Title
AN ACT relating to mental health and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Rep. Kimberly Banta [R] | Rep. John Blanton [R] | Rep. Myron Dossett [R] | Rep. David Hale [R] |
Rep. Scott Lewis [R] | Rep. Rob Rothenburger [R] | Rep. Buddy Wheatley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 18, 2020 |
2020-03-12 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2020-03-11 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2020-03-05 | House | posted in committee |
2020-02-20 | House | to Veterans, Military Affairs, and Public Protection (H) |
2020-02-18 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Appropriations
Cities
Counties
Education, Vocational
Firefighters and Fire Departments
Health and Medical Services
Insurance, Health
Local Government
Local Mandate
Mental Disability
Mental Health
Safety
Cities
Counties
Education, Vocational
Firefighters and Fire Departments
Health and Medical Services
Insurance, Health
Local Government
Local Mandate
Mental Disability
Mental Health
Safety