KY HB435 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-25 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-25 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 342.165 to require employers who have contracted for services be liable to employees for the payment of an increased award due to the safety violation of another entity who contracted with the employer for services; amend KRS 342.990 to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to safety violations.
Sponsors
Rep. David Floyd [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | |
2010-03-24 | returned to Rules (H) | |
2010-03-24 | taken from the Orders of the Day | |
2010-03-11 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 12, 2010 | |
2010-03-09 | floor amendments (1) (2) and (3-title) filed | |
2010-03-05 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-03-04 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | |
2010-02-18 | posted in committee | |
2010-02-17 | to Labor & Industry (H) | |
2010-02-16 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB435.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/HB435/bill.doc |